Espinoza v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Guillermo Espinoza
Defendant: Green Dot, Green Dot Bank and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00383
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Guillermo Espinoza (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Ibey, Jason)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from USDC of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01972. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge David Barlow.
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Guillermo Espinoza Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ibey, Jason) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred to District of Utah. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Utah*.*351 South West Temple, Rm. 1.100**Salt Lake City, Utah 84101*. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Order Taking Motion Under Submission: Defendants' #11 MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration is currently set for hearing on February 3, 2020. The Court finds this matter suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required, and the hearing is taken off calendar. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on January 29, 2020. (no document attached) (mxt) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION Transfer or,in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration re #1 Complaint, filed by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc. (Totino, Edward) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Recent Authority by Guillermo Espinoza re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION Transfer or,in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration re #1 Complaint, filed by Guillermo Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff in Support, #2 Proof of Service)(Tiller, Ahren) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby Hsu on behalf of Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc. (Hsu, Kirby)Attorney Kirby Hsu added to party Green Dot Bank (pty:dft), Attorney Kirby Hsu added to party Green Dot Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kirby Hsu added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Transfer or,in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration re #1 Complaint, by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Mark Lauderdale in Support of Motion for Transfer of in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Totino, Edward) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to extend deadline to answer or respond to Class Action Complaint to on or before 12/5/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/04/2019. (jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart Inc... (Totino, Edward) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Green Dot Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Green Dot Corporation.. (Totino, Edward)(jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Green Dot Bank d/b/a Bonneville Bank for Green Dot Corporation.. (Totino, Edward) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond to Class Action Complaint by Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc.. (Totino, Edward)Attorney Edward D Totino added to party Green Dot Bank (pty:dft), Attorney Edward D Totino added to party Green Dot Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Edward D Totino added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Guillermo Espinoza (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Guillermo Espinoza(pty:pla) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Ibey on behalf of Guillermo Espinoza (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ibey, Jason)Attorney Jason A. Ibey added to party Guillermo Espinoza(pty:pla) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ryan Barthel on behalf of Guillermo Espinoza (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Barthel, Nicholas)Attorney Nicholas Ryan Barthel added to party Guillermo Espinoza(pty:pla) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Green Dot Bank, Green Dot Corporation, Walmart Inc., DOES 1-50( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13049352.), filed by Guillermo Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Venue)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01972-MMA-RBB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Tiller, Ahren)(sxa) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Espinoza
Represented By: Jason Alan Ibey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?