Ferrando v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Todd J. Ferrando
Defendant: Mike Hadden, Utah Department of Corrections, Robert Powell and Carl Muniz
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00386
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the initial court filing fee (30 days) filed by Plaintiff Todd J. Ferrando. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 08/06/2020. (kpf)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Mike Hadden, Carl Muniz, Robert Powell, Utah Department of Corrections (Originally received by the court on 06/18/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Todd J. Ferrando. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (jl)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $7.39. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/07/2020. (jl)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Mail sent to Todd J. Ferrando. Return to sender no longer located at the Uintah County Jail. Prisoner Offender Locator locates him at the Duchesne Co Jail. The attached document will be re mailed. (kpf)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Todd J. Ferrando received from Correctional Institution (jl)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/18/2020) filed by Plaintiff Todd J. Ferrando. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrando v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd J. Ferrando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?