Thompson v. Chief Executive of Utah, The et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Thompson
Defendant: Grievance Coordinator, The, Warden of Each Facility Housing Inmates, Chief Executive of Utah, The and Hand of the Department of Corrections of Utah, The
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2020cv00459
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Wesley Thompson received from Correctional Institution (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) Modified to correct the date it was filed on 8/18/2020 (kpf).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is ordered that: Though the Court has already granted Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.13 within thirty days of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff shall complete the consent to collection of fees and submit it to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiffs correctional facility and also submit a copy of the signed consent to this Court within thirty days from the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. See order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/14/2020. (kpf)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, Utah State Prison Inmate Grama Request Form for Wesley Thompson received from Correctional Institution (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter)(kpf)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Chief Executive of Utah, The, Grievance Coordinator, The, Hand of the Department of Corrections of Utah, The, Warden of Each Facility Housing Inmates (Originally received by the court on 6/26/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Wesley Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (kn) Modified on 7/15/2020 to correct date originally received (kn).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #3 Motion for Service of Process. ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/14/2020. (kn)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Defendants filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (kn)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (kn)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/25/2020) filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Chief Executive of Utah, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grievance Coordinator, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Each Facility Housing Inmates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Executive of Utah, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hand of the Department of Corrections of Utah, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?