Stevens et al v. Schroeder
Plaintiff: Mark E. Stevens and Paula K. Stevens
Defendant: Christopher Schroeder, Unified Police Department and Salt Lake City
Case Number: 2:2020cv00510
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #7 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Modification of Docket: Error: Defendants Salt Lake City and Unified Police Department erroneously left off the docket at case opening per #2 Complaint. Correction: They have been added to the case. (alf)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Christopher Schroeder, Unified Police Department. (alf)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Christopher Schroeder, Plaintiffs Mark E. Stevens, Paula K. Stevens. Form due by 8/28/2020. (alf)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand of Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and Christopher Schroeder filed by Christopher Schroeder. Attorney R. Scott Young added to party Christopher Schroeder(pty:dft)(Young, R.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/20. (alf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ***CORRECTED*** **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher Schroeder. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher Schroeder. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3652282) filed by Mark E. Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Weber, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs Mark E. Stevens, Paula K. Stevens is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Stevens
Represented By: Thomas D. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula K. Stevens
Represented By: Thomas D. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Schroeder
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?