Datrec v. MyHeritage USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Datrec
Defendant: MyHeritage Ltd and MyHeritage USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00514
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lnp)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted by DatRec are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party will be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/8/2020. (lnp)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschmann, Craig)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/18/20. (jrj)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Datrec. (alf)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. (alf)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Datrec, Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. Form due by 8/27/2020. (alf)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Foster, Brett)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara L. Kapaloski on behalf of MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc (Kapaloski, Tamara)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Miller on behalf of MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc (Miller, Mark)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett L. Foster on behalf of MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc (Foster, Brett)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Ramey, III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3675463,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Buschmann, Craig)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datrec as to MyHeritage Ltd served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Buschmann, Craig)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datrec as to MyHeritage USA Inc served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Buschmann, Craig)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to MyHeritage Ltd. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to MyHeritage USA Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3653988) filed by Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US8156158, #2 Exhibit US8381309, #3 Exhibit US8990198) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Buschmann, Craig)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Datrec is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Datrec v. MyHeritage USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Datrec
Represented By: Craig A. Buschmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MyHeritage Ltd
Represented By: Tamara L. Kapaloski
Represented By: Brett L. Foster
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MyHeritage USA Inc
Represented By: Tamara L. Kapaloski
Represented By: Brett L. Foster
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?