Johnson v. Flores et al
Plaintiff: Jose Leon Johnson
Defendant: Omar Flores and Unified Police
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2020cv00532
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Jose Leon Johnson received from Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(nl)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Modification of Docket: Error: Incorrectly put defendant as filer. Correction: Changed filer to plaintiff. re #3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All defendants, #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #5 Complaint. (jl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter from Sheriff's Office - re Grama request. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Omar Flores, Unified Police (Originally received by the court on 07/27/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jose Leon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (jl) Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct filer (jl).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 08/19/2020. (jl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All defendants filed by Plaintiff Jose Leon Johnson. (jl) Modified on 8/20/2020 by changing date filed (jl). Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct filer (nl).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jose Leon Johnson. (jl) Modified on 8/20/2020 by changing the date filed (jl). Modified on 8/28/2020 to correct filer (nl).
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/27/2020) filed by Plaintiff Jose Leon Johnson. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Leon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?