Johnson v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA et al
Plaintiff: Tanya Johnson
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Womens Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Coopersurgical, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00586
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Teva Women's Health.(Fowler, Tracy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Teva Womens Health LLC.(Fowler, Tracy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA.(Fowler, Tracy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Cynthia Wallace, #2 Exhibit 2 - APA for certain ParaGard Assets)(Fowler, Tracy)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Teva Women's Health, Teva Womens Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., Plaintiff Tanya Johnson. Form due by 10/19/2020. (alf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Teva Women's Health, Teva Womens Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Fowler, Tracy)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Teva Women's Health, Teva Womens Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. with Jury Demand. Removed Defendants: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc.. filed by Tanya Johnson. (Mismash, Nancy)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #17 Stipulation which has been STRICKEN. The document should be filed as an Amended Complaint (as defendants have not answered or responded) or Motion to Amend Complaint. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT by Tanya Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mismash, Nancy) Modified on 10/1/2020 - document stricken as improperly filed. See Notice of Deficiency. (alf).
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed on 9/24/2020 in MDL No. 2974. (Hard copies received on 9/29/2002; Documents retrieved for filing through PACER.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Transfer, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service)(jwt)
September 17, 2020 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Teva Women's Health answer due 9/30/2020; The Cooper Companies, Inc. answer due 10/1/2020. (alf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Johnson as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc Summons)(Mismash, Nancy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Johnson as to Coopersurgical, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Coppersurgical Inc Summons)(Mismash, Nancy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Johnson as to Teva Womens Health LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teva Women's Health LLC Summons)(Mismash, Nancy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Johnson as to The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Copper Companies, Inc Summons)(Mismash, Nancy) Modified on 9/17/2020 to correct date of service per counsel request and date indicated on the return (alf).
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Johnson as to Teva Women's Health served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teva Women's Health Inc Summons)(Mismash, Nancy) Modified on 9/17/2020 to correct date of service per counsel request and date indicated on the return (alf).
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Johnson as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teva Branded Summons)(Mismash, Nancy) Modified on 9/17/2020 to correct date of service per counsel request and date indicated on return (alf).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/21/20. (alf)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Coopersurgical, Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Teva Womens Health LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Teva Women's Health. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Teva Women's Health, Teva Womens Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3685235) filed by Tanya Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Mismash, Nancy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Tanya Johnson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Health LLC
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Johnson
Represented By: Nancy A. Mismash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?