Sorto Cardoza et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Leydi Jasmin Sorto Cardoza and Adonis Salvador Sorto Cardoza
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00591
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (lnp)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security (Originally received by the court on 08/19/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Leydi Jasmin Sorto Cardoza, Adonis Salvador Sorto Cardoza. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (dw)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/31/2020. (dw)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/31/2020. (dw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/19/2020) filed by Plaintiff Adonis Salvador Sorto Cardoza. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion to Proceed While In Forma Pauperis)(dw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/19/2020) filed by Plaintiff Leydi Jasmin Sorto Cardoza. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion to Proceed While In Forma Pauperis)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorto Cardoza et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leydi Jasmin Sorto Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adonis Salvador Sorto Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?