Peterson v. Community Treatment Alternatives et al
Plaintiff: Mariah Peterson
Defendant: Rebecca Barker, Joel Bingham, Community Treatment Alternatives doing business as CTA Community Supports and Monique Fitzpatrick
Case Number: 2:2020cv00603
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings for Plaintiff due by 12/11/2020. Amended Pleadings for Defendants due by 1/11/2021. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 12/11/2020. Joinder of Parties for Defendants due by 1/11/2021. Discovery due by 6/14/2021. Motions due by 8/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/29/2020. (lnp)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Peck, Loren)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Rebecca Barker, Joel Bingham, Community Treatment Alternatives, Monique Fitzpatrick. (Burt, Patrick)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/2/2020. (lnp)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/31/2020. (lnp)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Rebecca Barker, Joel Bingham, Community Treatment Alternatives, Monique Fitzpatrick, Plaintiff Mariah Peterson. (jl)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200904976, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3699911) filed by Community Treatment Alternatives, Joel Bingham, Monique Fitzpatrick, Rebecca Barker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Return of Service) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Burt, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Defendants Rebecca Barker, Joel Bingham, Community Treatment Alternatives, Monique Fitzpatrick is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Community Treatment Alternatives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Peterson
Represented By: Loren K. Peck
Represented By: Nathan A. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Barker
Represented By: Patrick C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Bingham
Represented By: Patrick C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Treatment Alternatives doing business as CTA Community Supports
Represented By: Patrick C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Patrick C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?