Datrec v. AdvancedMD
Plaintiff: Datrec
Defendant: AdvancedMD
Case Number: 2:2020cv00635
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #13 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for AdvancedMD, Inc. to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendant AdvancedMD, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/4/2020. No attached document. (med)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant AdvancedMD, Plaintiff Datrec. Form due by 11/19/2020. (alf)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time for AdvancedMD, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant AdvancedMD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Attorney Barry G. Stratford added to party AdvancedMD(pty:dft)(Stratford, Barry)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time for AdvancedMD, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by AdvancedMD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stratford, Barry)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline for AdvancedMD extended to 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/30/2020. No attached document. (med)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 Modification of Docket: Error: Document #9 was filed as a stipulation, should have been filed as a Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Has been corrected on the docket. (alf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION to Extend Time for AdvancedMD, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by AdvancedMD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stratford, Barry) Modified on 9/30/2020 to change to a stipulated motion (alf).
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datrec as to AdvancedMD served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Ramey, William)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William P. Ramey, III for Datrec.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/15/20. (alf)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Ramey, III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3717787,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschmann, Craig)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant within (7) days after the filing of the first answer. Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.2, the parties shall hold their conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than thirty-five (35) days after the filing of the first answer to discuss and address those matters found in the form scheduling order located on the court's website. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/14/20. (alf)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AdvancedMD. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AdvancedMD (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3715367) filed by Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent 8,156,158, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Buschmann, Craig)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Datrec is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Datrec v. AdvancedMD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Datrec
Represented By: Craig A. Buschmann
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvancedMD
Represented By: Barry G. Stratford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?