Lundberg v. Vivint Solar
Plaintiff: Jim Lundberg
Defendant: Vivint Solar
Case Number: 2:2020cv00683
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support and Memorand. Responses due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/19/20. (jrj)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support and Memorand (atk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Jim Lundberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Jordan, David)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jim Lundberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Bledsoe, Jordan)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/26/20. (jrj)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Jematisa Anderson in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vivint Solar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Incentive Plan, #3 Exhibit 2013 Plan, #4 Exhibit 2014 Equity Plan, #5 Exhibit 2015 RSU Agreement, #6 Exhibit 2016 RSU Agreement)(Tomsic, Peggy)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/22/2020. (atk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vivint Solar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2013 Plan, #3 Exhibit 2014 Award Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2014 Plan, #5 Exhibit 2015 RSU Agreement, #6 Exhibit 2016 RSU Agreement)(Tomsic, Peggy)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant L. Watson, III on behalf of Vivint Solar (Watson, Bryant)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Kris Biehn on behalf of Vivint Solar (Biehn, Geoffrey)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peggy A. Tomsic on behalf of Vivint Solar (Tomsic, Peggy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Lundberg as to Vivint Solar served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Issued Summons)(Bledsoe, Jordan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vivint Solar. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Vivint Solar (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3736174) filed by Jim Lundberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Jordan, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff Jim Lundberg is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundberg v. Vivint Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint Solar
Represented By: Bryant L. Watson, III
Represented By: Peggy A. Tomsic
Represented By: Geoffrey Kris Biehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Lundberg
Represented By: David J. Jordan
Represented By: Jordan C. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?