Bob Mills Furniture v. Advanced Comfort Technologies
Plaintiff: Bob Mills Furniture
Defendant: Advanced Comfort Technologies
Case Number: 2:2020cv00699
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/23/2021. Motions due by 9/23/2021. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/23/20. (alf)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Ranschau, Beth)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bob Mills Furniture as to Advanced Comfort Technologies Waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Toth, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/5/20. (alf)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Advanced Comfort Technologies. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Advanced Comfort Technologies (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3742493) filed by Bob Mills Furniture. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Retailer & Marketing Agreement) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Toth, Justin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Bob Mills Furniture is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bob Mills Furniture v. Advanced Comfort Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Comfort Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Mills Furniture
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: Beth J. Ranschau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?