W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP v. Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP
Defendant: Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00722
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert J. McAughan, Jr., for Defendant Merit Medical Systems, Inc. (rks)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ryan E. Dornberger, Bryan Guy Harrison, for Plaintiff W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP (Attachments: #1 PHV - Bryan Harrison) (rks)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from USDC of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-02990. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge Dee Benson.
October 20, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the District of Utah. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/20/2020, filed. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the District of Utah. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to DISTRICT OF UTAH, filed by Merit Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McAughan, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to DISTRICT OF UTAH, filed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Dornberger, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merit Medical Systems, Inc., filed.(Lorimer, Brent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Extension ORDER terminating #12 . By 10/12/2020, W.H. Wall Family Holdings may respond to the motion to dismiss or transfer venue. By 10/19/2020 Merit Medical may reply. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Harrison, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP, filed.(Harrison, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan E. Dornberger on behalf of W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP, filed. (Dornberger, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Brent P. Lorimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case to DISTRICT OF UTAH( Motion Docket Date 10/8/2020.) by Merit Medical Systems, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(McAughan, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Brent P. Lorimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Merit Medical Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2020. (McAughan, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Merit Medical Systems, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020, filed.(Harrison, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Merit Medical Systems, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JosephWellsadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP, filed.(Harrison, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25116003) filed by W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Harrison, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP v. Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.H. Wall Family Holdings, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?