Short v. Sorenson Communications et al
Plaintiff: Austin Short
Defendant: Sorenson Communications and Luc Richard
Case Number: 2:2020cv00778
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/11/20. (dla)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/10/2020. (mjm)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Sorenson Communications.(Boren, Jason)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Luc Richard and Sorenson Communications to 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/2/20. (alf)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boren, Jason)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Juliana R. van Hoeven for Luc Richard and Sorenson Communications.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/30/20. (alf)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Juliana R. van Hoeven , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3811932,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Boren, Jason)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #6 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Austin Short. (alf)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications, Plaintiff Austin Short. Form due by 11/19/2020. (alf)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Acceptance of Service Sorenson Communications, Acceptance of Service Lu Richards, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and all applicable State Court Returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Acceptance of Service Sorenson Communications, #4 Acceptance of Service Lu Richard, #5 Acceptance of Service Return of Electronic Notification (Sorenson and Richard), #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Juliana R. van Hoeven, for Defendants Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications (jl)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications, Plaintiff Austin Short. (jl)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Salt Lake County, case number 200905310, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3783379) filed by Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initiating Court Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Boren, Jason)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Luc Richard, Sorenson Communications is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. Sorenson Communications et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Short
Represented By: Katherine Allyce Panzer
Represented By: April L. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorenson Communications
Represented By: Jason D. Boren
Represented By: Juliana R. Van Hoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luc Richard
Represented By: Jason D. Boren
Represented By: Juliana R. Van Hoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?