Wach v. Varoz et al
Plaintiff: Paul Wach
Defendant: Marshall Thompson, Utah Department of Corrections Board and Parole Members, Utah Department of Corrections, Carrie L. Cochran, Brett Varoz, Utah Board of Pardons and Parole, Mike Haddon, Greg Johnson and Dona Campagna
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00847
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Carrie L. Cochran. (jl)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Greg Johnson. (jl)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Marshall Thompson. (jl)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Mike Haddon. (jl)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Dona Campagna. (jl)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Utah Board of Pardons and Parole. (jl)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brett Varoz. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) Modified on 1/26/2021 as summons were not issued electronically but issued through the mail(jl).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER WITHDRAWING Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under under (b)(1)(B) reference Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/21/21. (ss)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/19/21. (ss)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Paul Wach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Se Proposed Order)(dw)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrie L. Cochran, Mike Haddon, Greg Johnson, Marshall Thompson, Utah Board of Pardons and Parole, Utah Department of Corrections, Utah Department of Corrections Board and Parole Members, Brett Varoz (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681092517) filed by Paul Wach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Letter, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Envelope) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wach v. Varoz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections Board and Parole Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Varoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Board of Pardons and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Haddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Campagna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?