Partnet v. Credence Management Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Partnet
Defendant: Bellwether Technology, Credence Management Solutions and Christopher Williams
Case Number: 2:2020cv00865
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Civil Case Terminated per Notice #18 . (alf)
January 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Partnet (Johnson, Eric)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric U. Johnson on behalf of Partnet (Johnson, Eric)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss #10 . Plaintiff's response due 1/27/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/20/21. (alf)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Partnet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jepson, Christina)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Stipulated Motion for Case Scheduling. See order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/12/21. (alf)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew E. Feinberg for Credence Management Solutions.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/12/21. (alf)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order and Case Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Partnet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jepson, Christina)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Feinberg , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3864189,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pahnke, Z.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Stapleford Declaration, #2 Exhibit B Williams Declaration)(Pahnke, Z.)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/17/2020. (jwt)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Supplement to Defendants Credence Management Solutions, LLC's and Christopher Williams' Notice of Removal of Action by Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams re #2 Notice of Removal, (Pahnke, Z.)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Credence Management Solutions and Christopher Williams to 12/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/16/20. (alf)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pahnke, Z.)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Acceptance of Service by Credence Management Solutions, Acceptance of Service Christopher Williams, Notice of Removal and all applicable State Court Returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Acceptance of Service CMS, #4 Acceptance of Service CMS Return of Electronic Notification, #5 Acceptance of Service Williams, #6 Acceptance of Service Williams Return of Electronic Notification, #7 Notice of Removal, #8 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams and Plaintiff Partnet. (dw)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams. (Pahnke, Z.)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200907032, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3828527) filed by Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Pahnke, Z.)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendants Credence Management Solutions, Christopher Williams are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Partnet v. Credence Management Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellwether Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credence Management Solutions
Represented By: Z. Ryan Pahnke
Represented By: Matthew E. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Williams
Represented By: Z. Ryan Pahnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Partnet
Represented By: Christina M. Jepson
Represented By: Gregory H. Gunn
Represented By: Eric U. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?