Chaturvedi v. Orbcomm Inc., et al
Plaintiff: VIVEK CHATURVEDI
Defendant: Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inthinc, Orbcomm Inc. and Todd W. Follmer
Case Number: 2:2020cv00914
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 11/21/2021. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/8/21. (dla)
February 5, 2021 Filing 84 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Obagi, Zein)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey M. Tillotson for Todd W. Follmer.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/2/21. (dla)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan R. Patton for Todd W. Follmer.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/2/21. (dla)
February 1, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey M. Tillotson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3900618,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Todd W. Follmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for PHV Admission of Jeffrey Tillotson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lebenta, Aaron)
February 1, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan R. Patton , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3900557,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Todd W. Follmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for PHV Admission of Jonathan R. Patton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lebenta, Aaron)
January 27, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Lebenta on behalf of Todd W. Follmer (Lebenta, Aaron)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Zein E. Obagi, Jr for Vivek Chaturvedi.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/11/21. (jwt)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/8/21. (dla)
January 4, 2021 Filing 75 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel advised that name of applicant in motion was incorrect. Correction: Corrected name of applicant to Zein E. Obagi, Jr. re #74 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (dla)
January 4, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cody Winchester Zein E. Obagi, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3860486,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff VIVEK CHATURVEDI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Winchester, Cody) Modified by correcting name of applicant on 1/4/2021 (dla).
January 4, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Z. Winchester on behalf of VIVEK CHATURVEDI (Winchester, Cody)
December 29, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jonathan Robert Patton, for Defendant Todd W. Follmer. (nl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeffrey Mark Tillotson, for Defendant Todd W. Follmer. (nl) Modified on 12/29/2020 to add attorney's name(nl).
December 29, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Patrick Joseph Cain, for Defendant Orbcomm Inc. (nl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Colin Dang Delaney, for Defendant Orbcomm Inc. (nl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Hee Joong Kim, for Plaintiff VIVEK CHATURVEDI. (nl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Zein E. Obagi, Jr. and Tara H. Hattendorf, for Plaintiff VIVEK CHATURVEDI. (nl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 66 Case transferred in from USDC of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-01875. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Modified by adding assigned judge on 1/4/2021 (rks).
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #44 FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF UTAH. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/23/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2020 re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Todd Follmer. Total Time in Court: 22 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Zein Obagi 04/29/2021. Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Patton 04/29/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 reset to 12/17/2020 09:00 AM. #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Hearing reset to 12/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appea rances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 16, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. ( This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue set for 12/10/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 8, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Related documents(s) #44 ) (This is a tex t-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #58 MOTION FOR PRO HOC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/19/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15070230.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/15/2020 filed by Todd Follmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Patton, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor.No other dates set at this time.FTR Time: 11:10 - 11:17. Plaintiff Attorney: Zein Obagi, Hee Kim via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Jeff Tillotson, Jon Patton via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #56 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/15/2020.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15070230.) filed by Todd Follmer. (Patton, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vivek Chaturvedi. (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 10/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Todd Follmer (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:00 AM will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 14, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vivek Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kim, Hee) (Filed on 10/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ) filed byTodd Follmer. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 50 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to inthinc, Inc., a Delaware corporation; and inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Related documents(s) #48 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE by Vivek Chaturvedi re #48 MOTION for Entry of Default Plaintiff Vivek Chaturvedi's Application for Entry of Default Against Defendants inthinc, Inc., and inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. First Amended Proof of Service re: Plaintiff Vivek Chaturvedi's Application for Entry of Default Against Defendants inthinc, Inc., and inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 8/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Entry of Default Plaintiff Vivek Chaturvedi's Application for Entry of Default Against Defendants inthinc, Inc., and inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. filed by Vivek Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Hee J. Kim in Support of Application for Entry of Default against Defendants inthinc, Inc., and inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.)(Kim, Hee) (Filed on 8/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ) Plaintiff Vivek Chaturvedi's Opposition to Defendant Todd Follmer's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byVivek Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Vivek Chaturvedi in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Todd Follmer's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Kim, Hee) (Filed on 8/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivek Chaturvedi. inthinc, Inc. served on 7/18/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Per FRCP 4(e)(1) and CCP 415.40 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Confirmation of Delivery)(Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 8/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivek Chaturvedi. Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. served on 7/18/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. Per FRCP 4(e)(1) and CCP 415.40 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Return Receipt for Inthinc Tech)(Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 8/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Todd Follmer. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/20/2020. Replies due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/6/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/6/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #42 STIPULATION SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on July 30, 2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #39 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default, #40 Notice (Other) filed by Todd Follmer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Mark Tillotson (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Vivek Chaturvedi re #39 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Notice of Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Todd Follmer (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 7/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 39 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Todd Follmer, an individual. (Related documents(s) #38 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 38 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Todd Follmer filed by Vivek Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF HEE J. KIM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT TODD FOLLMER)(Hattendorf, Tara) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivek Chaturvedi. Todd Follmer served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Hattendorf, Tara) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 36 * See #38 Amended Motion* MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Todd Follmer filed by Vivek Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Hee J. Kim in Support of Application for Entry of Default against Defendant Todd Follmer)(Kim, Hee) (Filed on 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/24/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vivek Chaturvedi (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #35 Certificate of Service filed by Vivek Chaturve di (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge based on information in plaintiff's CMC statement, Dkt. No. #26 at p. 2, it appears impractical that all parties will be able to consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, this case will be randomly reassigned to a District Court Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)[Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Reissued as to Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc., inthinc, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Vivek Chaturvedi as to Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.. Undeliverable as Addressed (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 29 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Vivek Chaturvedi as to inthinc, Inc.. Undeliverable as Addressed (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103] See Dkt #24 Issued as to Inthinc, Inc. and #25 Issued as to Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. Only 1 summons can be issued p er defendant at a time. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office unless previously issued summons are returned unexecuted. Re: #27 Proposed Summons filed by Vivek Chaturvedi, #28 Proposed Summons filed by Vivek Chaturvedi (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 7/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 7/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vivek Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 7/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. as to First Amended Complaint. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to inthinc, Inc. as to First Amended Complaint (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed Summons. (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 6/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Summons. (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 6/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Todd Follmer. Filed byVivek Chaturvedi. (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 6/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE. The motion to remand is denied. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Vivek Chaturvedi re #17 Order,, Add and Terminate Parties,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, Plaintiff Vivek Chaturvedi's Withdrawal of Request to Remand (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 6/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivek Chaturvedi. Todd Follmer served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 6/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 STIPULATION IN PART. Defendant ORBCOMM, INC. is dismissed without prejudice. The request to remand is DENIED. Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2020 is continued to 7/15/2020, at 10:00 AM. Counsel may participate by telephone. Plaintiff to file brief, by 6/26, explaining how court can remand to state court without the consent to remand by defendant Follmer. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/12/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing ORBCOMM, INC., Without Prejudice; and 2. Remanding Action to State Court. filed by Orbcomm Inc.. (Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 6/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Todd Follmer. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 6/1/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kim, Hee) (Filed on 5/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 5/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Colin Dang Delaney Pro Hac Vice representing Orbcomm, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Colin Dang Delaney ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14442835.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/06/2020 filed by Orbcomm Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 5/6/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vivek Chaturvedi.. (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orbcomm Inc... (Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 3/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Orbcomm Inc. (Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 3/18/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vivek Chaturvedi re 1 Notice of Removal, (Obagi, Zein) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Orbcomm Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, Proof Of Filing And Service Of Notice To State Court And Adverse Party (Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by ORBCOMM, INC., a foreign corporation re 1 Notice of Removal, (Cain, Patrick) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 Answer to Removal Complaint see Exhibit B of Removal Complaint 1 by Orbcomm Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaturvedi v. Orbcomm Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inthinc Technology Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inthinc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbcomm Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd W. Follmer
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Tillotson
Represented By: Aaron D. Lebenta
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIVEK CHATURVEDI
Represented By: Cody Z. Winchester
Represented By: Zein E. Obagi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?