Lechtenberger v. Red Leaf Resources
Plaintiff: Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger
Defendant: Red Leaf Resources
Case Number: 2:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Third District Court, Salt Lake County via US Mail Remand Letter, docket sheet sent given case number 200907438. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet) (alf)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Remand. Action remanded to state court. Case closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/1/21. (alf)
March 1, 2021 Civil Case Terminated per order [17 - remand to state court. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to case. (alf)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/16/21. (ss)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/12/21. (ss)
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now been passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger. (alf)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #6 First MOTION to Remand to Third District filed by Plaintiff Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger. (Bondy, Adam)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand to Third District filed by Plaintiff Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger. (Bondy, Adam)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to Third District filed by Defendant Red Leaf Resources. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of M. Christopher Moon, #2 Exhibit A -- Email)(Moon, M.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Red Leaf Resources.(Vogel, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 1/6/21. (alf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to Third District filed by Plaintiff Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger. (Bondy, Adam)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 File Received from Third District Court, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger, Defendant Red Leaf Resources. Form due by 1/19/2021. (dw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed to Plaintiff Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger and Defendant Red Leaf Resources. (dw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200907438, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3859377) filed by Red Leaf Resources. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A -- Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B -- Docket) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Moon, M.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendant Red Leaf Resources is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lechtenberger v. Red Leaf Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Adolph Lechtenberger
Represented By: J. Angus Edwards
Represented By: Kenneth A. Okazaki
Represented By: Adam Bondy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Leaf Resources
Represented By: Robert D. Vogel
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?