Mountain Country Foods v. Great West-Teeuwissen et al
Plaintiff: Mountain Country Foods
Defendant: Great West-Teeuwissen, Great West and Van Hessen Great West Holding
Case Number: 2:2021cv00033
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/14/2022. Motions due by 3/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/4/21. (alf)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Gilson, James)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Standing Order in Civil Cases by Mountain Country Foods re #7 Civil Standing Order (Gilson, James)
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Defendants Great West, Great West-Teeuwissen (Thompson, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Great West, Great West-Teeuwissen.(Thompson, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Thompson on behalf of Great West, Great West-Teeuwissen (Thompson, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/17/21. (alf)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/16/21. (ss)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/12/21. (ss)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mountain Country Foods as to Great West-Teeuwissen served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Gilson, James)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mountain Country Foods as to Great West served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Gilson, James)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Great West. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Great West-Teeuwissen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3881711) filed by Mountain Country Foods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Gilson, James)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Mountain Country Foods is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Country Foods v. Great West-Teeuwissen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West-Teeuwissen
Represented By: Robert W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West
Represented By: Robert W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Hessen Great West Holding
Represented By: Robert W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Country Foods
Represented By: Cole P. Crowther
Represented By: James D. Gilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?