Enodien et al v. Pekoske et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Enodien and Marie Enodien
Defendant: Angela Goldinger, David Pekoske, Kin Ma and Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 2:2021cv00074
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/12/21. (ss)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/5/21. (ss)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Civil Process Clerk United States Attorney, District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Angela Goldinger. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kin Ma. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David Pekoske. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tracy Renaud. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBITS filed by Dennis Enodien, Marie Enodien for #3 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Heier, David) Modified on 2/5/2021 by linking exhibits to complaint (jl).
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against Angela Goldinger, Kin Ma, David Pekoske, Tracy Renaud (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTOC-3903696) filed by Marie Enodien, Dennis Enodien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Heier, David) Modified on 2/4/2021 (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3903696) originally paid in case 2:21-cv-00070-TC on 2/3/2021, filing date changed to 2/3/2021(nl).
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Dennis Enodien, Marie Enodien is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enodien et al v. Pekoske et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Goldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kin Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Enodien
Represented By: David C. Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Enodien
Represented By: David C. Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?