Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance and Wilderness Society, The
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 2:2021cv00091
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Turcke on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Turcke, Paul)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Brett Grosko on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Grosko, John)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/19/2021. (eat)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Huber United States Attorney. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Monty Wilkinson Acting Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3917885) filed by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Wilderness Society, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Peterson, Laura)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiffs Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Wilderness Society, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Laura E. Peterson
Represented By: Joseph J. Bushyhead
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Society, The
Represented By: Laura E. Peterson
Represented By: Joseph J. Bushyhead
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?