David Sanchez v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Sanchez
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00158
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Drew R Hansen and Pavneet Singh Mac, for Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (nl)
March 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Neama Rahmani, for Plaintiff David Sanchez. (nl)
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Melineh Kasbarian and Ronaldo Leonardo Zambrano, for Plaintiff David Sanchez. (nl)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from USDC of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-02643. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Utah District case number 2:21-cv-00158-DAO assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg.
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT C.R. ENGLAND'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant C.R. England, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue #11 is GRANTED. The Court TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the District of Utah pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue #11 presently scheduled for hearing on February 26, 2021, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United District Court for the District of Utah #11 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Hansen, Drew) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United District Court for the District of Utah #11 filed by Plaintiff David Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT C.R. ENGLAND, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)(Zambrano, Ronald) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant C.R. England, Inc., Does amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff David Sanchez(Zambrano, Ronald) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #10 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file and serve the First Amended Complaint, ("FAC") (a copy of which is attached to the Stipulation as Exhibit 1) within three business days of the Court issuing this Order. Defendant shall filed its response to the FAC the later of 30 days after this Court issues its ruling on Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to file its responsive pleading or, in the event the case is transferred to the District of Utah, 30 days after the case is transferred and a new matter number is assigned by the District of Utah. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Callister, #2 Declaration of Pavneet Singh Mac, #3 Proposed Order) (Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02643 DMG (SHKx). (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants C.R. England, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff David Sanchez. Filed in State Court on 11/10/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc., Proof of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court served on 12/23/2020. (Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc..(Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc., (Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2024778 Receipt No: ACACDC-29681054 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Service of Process, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Assignment, #5 Notice of Trial Setting Conference, #6 Entity Details) (Attorney Pavneet Singh Mac added to party C.R. England, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mac, Pavneet) [Transferred from California Central on 3/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Sanchez v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?