Deer Crest Master Association v. CenturyLink Sales Solutions
Plaintiff: Deer Crest Master Association
Defendant: CenturyLink Sales Solutions
Case Number: 2:2021cv00193
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Deer Crest Master Association. (Vaughn, Sarah)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The deadline to file an answer has passed, but no answer or motion for default has been filed. By May 24, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the status of the case and Plaintiff's intentions to proceed. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/10/2021. (med)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deer Crest Master Association as to CenturyLink Sales Solutions served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (Vaughn, Sarah)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to CenturyLink Sales Solutions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/30/21. (alf)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CenturyLink Sales Solutions (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3964183) filed by Deer Crest Master Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Vaughn, Sarah)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Deer Crest Master Association is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deer Crest Master Association v. CenturyLink Sales Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deer Crest Master Association
Represented By: Sarah C. Vaughn
Represented By: Jason W. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Sales Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?