In Re: Estate of Toleush Tolmakov
Petitioner: Estate of Toleush Tolmakov
Respondent: Freedom Holding, FFIN Securities and BMB Munai
Case Number: 2:2021cv00201
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #16 Memorandum Decision, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendants are ordered to pay attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $14,368.00 as set out in Docket Nos. #18 and #20 . Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/26/21. (jrj)
May 11, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of in Support of Attorney Fees filed by Estate of Toleush Tolmakov. (Spjute, Robert)
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #17 Notice of Transmittal. (reb)
May 7, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Penniann Schumann re #16 Memorandum Decision, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Aff of Attorney Fees Granted in Motion filed by Estate of Toleush Tolmakov. (Schumann, Penniann)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Third District Court via Mail. Certified Copy of the Memorandum and Decision Order Granting Remand sent re case number 193900639. (reb)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Remand to State Court Case Closed. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/29/2021. (reb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District Court in and for Salt Lake County State of Utah and Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand to State Court, #14 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Petitioner Estate of Toleush Tolmakov. (Schumann, Penniann)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District Court in and for Salt Lake County State of Utah and Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Petitioner Estate of Toleush Tolmakov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to REPLY Memo in support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to REPLY Memo in Support of Motion to Remand)(Schumann, Penniann)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Per instructions from chambers case reassigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Judge Tena Campbell no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:21-cv-00201-TS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jl)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Tena Campbell for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:21-cv-00201-TC. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/21/2021. (jl)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Martinez on behalf of FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding (Martinez, Christopher)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Milo Steven Marsden on behalf of FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding (Marsden, Milo)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District Court in and for Salt Lake County State of Utah and Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand to State Court (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) filed by Respondents FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jason Kerr, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Interlocutory Appeal)(Kerr, Jason)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER All case deadlines in this matter removed from state court are stayed pending decision on the motion to remand. If the matter is remanded, new deadlines and related motions can be addressed by the state court. If the matter is not remanded, this court will grant brief extensions and consider other requests related to the length of filings at that time. The #6 and #7 motions filed yesterday are denied without prejudice as moot. No attached document Signed by Judge David Barlow on 4/13/2021. (ath)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Opposition to Motion to Compel Freedom Holding Corporation to Pay interest on Unpaid Dividends and Undistributed Stock filed by Respondents FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order motion for leave to file overlenght Opposition to Motion to compel)(Kerr, Jason)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Opposition to Motion to Stay Execution of Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioner Estate of Toleush Tolmakov. (Schumann, Penniann)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER Pursuant to DUCivR 7-1(b)(3)(B), Defendants' response to #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court is due on or before April 20, 2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, to Defendants' response is due on or before May 4, 2021. After the briefing is complete, the court will decide whether to set the matter for hearing or decide the motion on the briefing. No attached document Signed by Judge David Barlow on 4/12/2021. (ath)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding (Kerr, Jason)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District Court in and for Salt Lake County State of Utah and Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Petitioner Estate of Toleush Tolmakov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion to Remand to State Court)(Schumann, Penniann)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, case number 19300639, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 4512875) filed by FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B - Answer Complaint) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Kerr, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Respondents FFIN Securities, Freedom Holding is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Estate of Toleush Tolmakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Freedom Holding
Represented By: Alan Dunaway
Represented By: Steven Garff
Represented By: Jason M. Kerr
Represented By: Milo Steven Marsden
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FFIN Securities
Represented By: Alan Dunaway
Represented By: Steven Garff
Represented By: Jason M. Kerr
Represented By: Milo Steven Marsden
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BMB Munai
Represented By: Alan Dunaway
Represented By: Steven Garff
Represented By: Jason M. Kerr
Represented By: Milo Steven Marsden
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Estate of Toleush Tolmakov
Represented By: Penniann J. Schumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?