Schmidt v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Vania Schmidt
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00212
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY WITH DUCivR 81-2(c). The deadlines concerning scheduling set forth in DUCivR 81-2(c) have expired. The parties are ordered to comply with the scheduling requirements of DUCivR 81-2(c) within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 05/26/2021. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint filed by Walmart Inc..(Rice, Mitchel)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Vania Schmidt. (Head, David)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Vania Schmidt, Defendant Walmart Inc. (alf)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Vania Schmidt. (alf)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Walmart Inc.. (alf)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Vania Schmidt, Defendant Walmart Inc.. Form due by 4/22/2021. (alf)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Vania Schmidt, Defendant Walmart Inc.. (mh)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Proposed and Not Signed Orders regarding Waiving Fees( motion unavailable for download), Motion, Proposed Order, Request to Submit and Order granting extension of time for Service of Process, 2nd Motion, Proposed Order, Request to Submit and Order granting 2nd Motion for Extension of time for Service of Process, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Motion to Waive Fees (Motion not available for download), #3 Complaint, Proposed Order re: Fees, Motion to Waive Fees (not available for download) Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Not signed Order to Waive Fees, #5 Not Signed Order to Waive Fees Return of Electronic Notification, #6 Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process, #7 Proposed Order re: Motion for Extension of Time, #8 Request to Submit Motion for Extension of Time, #9 Motion, Proposed Order and Request to Submit as to Motion for Extension of time Return of Electronic Notification, #10 Order granting Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #11 Order Return of Electronic Notification, #12 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #13 Proposed Order re: 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #14 Request to Submit 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #15 Order granting 2nd Motion of Time for Service of Process, #16 Order Return of Electronic Notification, #17 Notice of Removal, #18 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Rice, Mitchel)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walmart Inc..(Rice, Mitchel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200902589, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3972096) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Rice, Mitchel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Walmart Inc. is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vania Schmidt
Represented By: David S. Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?