Hodges v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: James Hodges
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00214
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Motions due by 7/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. 4-Day Jury Trial set for 1/9/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/6/21 (alt)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/5/21 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff James Hodges. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/9/21. (alf)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Rice, Mitchel)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Walmart Inc.. (alf)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff James Hodges, Defendant Walmart Inc.. Form due by 4/23/2021. (alf)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff James Hodges, Defendant Walmart Inc.. (nmt)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210901521, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3974055) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Rice, Mitchel)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendant Walmart Inc. is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hodges
Represented By: Parker A. Allred
Represented By: Alan D. Tucker
Represented By: Colby B. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?