Khan v. Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Iftikhar Khan
Counter Claimant: Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Nazir Khan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00337
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nazir Khan, Iftikhar Khan as to Merit Medical Systems, Inc. served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jl)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merit Medical Systems, Inc. filed by Nazir Khan, Iftikhar Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Envelope) (jl)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion. The court directs the Clerk's Office to make a separate docket entry for Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and exhibits. This Amended Complaint will be the operative pleading in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/28/21. (jwt)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan filed by Merit Medical Systems, Inc.. Attorney Brent P. Lorimer added to party Merit Medical Systems, Inc.(pty:dft)(Lorimer, Brent)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Pro Se Motion for Email Filing and Notification. Plaintiff is instructed to maintain a current operative email on file with the court at all times and to follow the requirements of Local Rule 5-1. PLEASE NOTE: This order grants Email Filing and Notification as to Plaintiff Nazir Khan ONLY. Plaintiff Iftikhar Khan did not file the required Electronic Notification Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/25/21. (alf)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Merit Medical Systems, Inc. (mh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 Pro Se MOTION for Email Filing and Notification filed by Plaintiffs Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan. (Attachments: #1 Reg Form as to Nazir only).(alf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Envelope)(alf)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan. (alf)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #6 Motion. The court is unable to discern the relief requested in Plaintiff's #6 Motion. The court therefore DENIES the Motion without prejudice. The court directs Plaintiff to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7, which requires motions to "state the relief sought." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 06/17/2021. No attached document. (jfm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Plaintiff Nazir Khan. (alf)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiff - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 28 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Iftikhar Khan, Nazir Khan. Form due by 6/29/2021. (alf)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT - Per General Order 20-034, non-prisoner pro se cases are to be assigned to a magistrate judge at case opening. This case was assigned to a district judge at case opening in error. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Judge Jill N. Parrish no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:21cv337-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nmt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2021: #1 Corrected Main Document) (nmt). Modified on 6/2/2021 Disregard main document, the attachment is the correct document(nmt).
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Merit Medical Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 4681094653) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Nazir Khan and Iftikhar Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Envelope) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (nmt) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/2/2021) (nl). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/2/2021 with corrected version of exhibit) (jwt). Modified on 6/8/2021 added Iftikhar Khan as filer(nmt).
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Nazir Khan is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day (PAID Receipt Number: 4681094653).NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Envelope 1) (nmt) Modified on 6/2/2021 entered in error (nmt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Merit Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nazir Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iftikhar Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?