Scanning Technologies Innovations v. Fishbowl Solutions
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations
Defendant: Fishbowl Solutions
Case Number: 2:2021cv00347
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Fishbowl Solutions. (jwt)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Fishbowl Solutions, Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations. Form due by 7/22/2021. (alf)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/6/2021. No attached document. (eh)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Fishbowl Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Nathan D. Thomas added to party Fishbowl Solutions(pty:dft)(Thomas, Nathan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #7 Return of Service. The document is stricken as improperly filed. The event "Summons Returned Executed" must be used and a copy of the Court issued summons needs to be attached. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Summons served on Dusty Miller on June 21, 2021, filed by Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations. (Dobbin, Geoffrey) Modified on 6/25/2021 - stricken as improperly filed (alf).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant within (7) days after the filing of the first answer. Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.2, the parties shall hold their conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than thirty-five (35) days after the filing of the first answer to discuss and address those matters found in the form scheduling order located on the court's website. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/4/21. (alf)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Fishbowl Solutions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nmt)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Scanning Technologies Innovations (Dobbin, Geoffrey)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4023022) filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 10,600,101, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Dobbin, Geoffrey)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scanning Technologies Innovations v. Fishbowl Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fishbowl Solutions
Represented By: Nathan D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Dobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?