Winters v. Empire Solar Group
Plaintiff: Gage Winters
Defendant: Empire Solar Group
Case Number: 2:2021cv00365
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:21-cv-00365-DBB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Because this case is a proposed class action, it is not feasible to obtain consent from all parties to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Additionally, Plaintiff has filed #13 MOTION for Entry of Default on the grounds that the named Defendant has been served with process but has failed to file a timely answer or other response to the complaint. Thus, the named Defendant is unable to consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. For those reasons, the court ORDERS that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/27/2021. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Empire Solar Group and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Chad)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gage Winters as to All Defendants. (Johnson, Chad)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 06/22/2021. (jl)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Empire Solar Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary E. Olsen for Gage Winters.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/15/21. (alf)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stuart J. Miller for Gage Winters.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/15/21. (alf)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary E Olsen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032408,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Chad)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart J Miller , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032395,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Chad)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #3 and #4 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Amendments to DUCivR 83-1 became effective on December 1, 2020. Petitioners' motions are denied for failure to comply with DUCivR 83-1.1(c)(1)(A)(i)-(iii). Specifically, the application lacks certification that Petitioners (1) do not maintain law offices in Utah and (2) have not been admitted pro hac vice in any case in this district in the previous 5 years. Petitioners may file renewed motions after reviewing the revised rule and utilizing the new motion form and application form for pro hac vice status available on the court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/14/2021. No attached document. (lrh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary E. Olson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032408,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting/Denying Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Johnson, Chad)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart J. Miller , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032395,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting/Denying Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Johnson, Chad)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Demand against Empire Solar Group (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4032389) filed by Gage Winters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Johnson, Chad)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Gage Winters is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Empire Solar Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gage Winters
Represented By: Stuart J. Miller
Represented By: Mary E. Olsen
Represented By: Lauren I. Scholnick
Represented By: Chad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Solar Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?