Younger v. Olsen et al
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Younger
Defendant: Tony Washington, FNU Olsen, Michelle Tsi, Mathew Bradley and FNU Cusik
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00372
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Certificate re: Inmate Account & Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Joshua A. Younger. (kpf)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Mathew Bradley, FNU Cusik, FNU Olsen, Michelle Tsi, Tony Washington (Originally received by the court on 06/16/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Joshua A. Younger. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit General Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #5 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (mh)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/25/2021. (mh)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Joshua A. Younger. (mh)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement, #6 Envelope)(nmt)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Joshua A. Younger received from Correctional Institution. (nmt)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/16/2021) filed by Plaintiff Joshua A. Younger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Younger v. Olsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Tsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cusik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?