Delta Pegasus Management et al v. NetJets Sales et al
Plaintiff: Delta Pegasus Management and Michael L. Labertew
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, NetJets Services and NetJets Sales
Case Number: 2:2021cv00393
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 19, 2021 Filing 21 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Delta Pegasus Management, Michael L. Labertew. (alf)
August 19, 2021 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services. (alf)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Response/Opposition due by 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/18/21. (alf)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Delta Pegasus Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue)(Waddoups, Trent)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services. (Rothschild, Brian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services. (Rothschild, Brian)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Delta Pegasus Management, Michael L. Labertew, Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services. Form due by 8/19/2021. (alf)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney. Christopher J. Hogan for Delta Pegasus Management, NetJets Aviation, for NetJets Sales,Christopher J. Hogan for NetJets Services.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/19/2021. (jwt) Modified on 7/26/2021 attorney removed from plaintiff Delta Pegasus(nl).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Upon review, it appears that the additional information requested in 12 has been provided by the Applicant, and the Court's request for supplementation of the PHV Motion is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/19/2021.
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 Defendants are instructed to supplement their #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christopher J. Hogan with the current application for pro hac vice admission form, available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. The deadline for Defendants to supplement their Motion is July 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/19/2021.
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Hogan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4061400,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Brian)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for NetJets Aviation, for NetJets Sales, and for NetJets Services. Answer due 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/19/2021. (jl)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rothschild, Brian)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Brian)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Rothschild on behalf of NetJets Aviation, NetJets Sales, NetJets Services (Rothschild, Brian)
June 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/26/21. (alf)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to NetJets Aviation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to NetJets Sales. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to NetJets Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4041675) filed by Delta Pegasus Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exchange Agreement, #3 Exhibit Management Agreement, #4 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Waddoups, Trent)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Delta Pegasus Management, Michael L. Labertew are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Pegasus Management et al v. NetJets Sales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Pegasus Management
Represented By: Trent J. Waddoups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Labertew
Represented By: Trent J. Waddoups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Aviation
Represented By: Brian M. Rothschild
Represented By: Christopher J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Services
Represented By: Brian M. Rothschild
Represented By: Christopher J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Sales
Represented By: Brian M. Rothschild
Represented By: Christopher J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?