WealthVest Marketing v. Rogers
Plaintiff: WealthVest Marketing
Defendant: Marc Rogers
Case Number: 2:2021cv00499
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 24 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
October 8, 2021 Filing 23 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Weron, Kathleen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support re Marc Rogers' Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (Dkt. 9) filed by Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing. (Weron, Kathleen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 21 Modification of Docket: re 20 Modification of Docket - Modification erroneously listed document #9 as being stricken. It is document #19 that has been stricken. Docket text corrected. No further action needed, apologies from the Court. (alf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 Modification of Docket: Error: Document #19 stricken per request of counsel. To be refiled. Motion terminated. (alf) Modified on 10/5/2021 (alf).
October 5, 2021 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support re Marc Rogers' Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (Dkt. 9) filed by Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing. (Weron, Kathleen) Modified on 10/5/2021 stricken per request of counsel, to be refiled. (alf).
October 1, 2021 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing. (alf)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #10 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Tuffnell for Marc Rogers.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/22/21. (alf)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER terminating #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per the filing of a new motion #14 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/22/2021. No attached document. (med)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Tuffnell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number BUTDC-4113698,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Marc Rogers, Counter Claimant Marc Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice)(Weber, Bradley)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Defendant is instructed to supplement his #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission to include all information listed in the current form motion, available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. The supplement must be filed within 14 days. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/17/2021. (eh)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Tuffnell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number BUTDC-4113698,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Marc Rogers, Counter Claimant Marc Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Application)(Weber, Bradley)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J. Phelps on behalf of Marc Rogers (Phelps, Travis)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Marc Rogers, Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing. Form due by 9/30/2021. (alf)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against WealthVest Marketing filed by Marc Rogers. Attorney Bradley J. Weber added to party Marc Rogers(pty:dft)(Weber, Bradley)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul J. Greco for WealthVest Marketing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/31/21. (alf)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Greco , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4097201,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admissaion of Paul J. Greco, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Paul J. Greco)(Weron, Kathleen)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by WealthVest Marketing as to Marc Rogers served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Court Issued Summons to Marc Rogers)(Weron, Kathleen)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/23/21. (alf)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Marc Rogers. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Paul J. Greco, for Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing. (mh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Marc Rogers (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4089054) filed by WealthVest Marketing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WealthVest Employment Agreement - Rogers, #2 Exhibit B - WealthVest IC Agreement - Rogers, #3 Exhibit C - WealthVest Letter - Rogers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet - Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Weron, Kathleen)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff WealthVest Marketing is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WealthVest Marketing v. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WealthVest Marketing
Represented By: Kathleen D Weron
Represented By: Paul J. Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Rogers
Represented By: John B Tuffnell
Represented By: Travis J. Phelps
Represented By: Bradley J. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?