Baker v. Total Home Services of Utah et al
Plaintiff: David Baker
Defendant: Total Home Services of Utah, Roger Hughes and Rhonda Hughes
Case Number: 2:2021cv00547
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The court HEREBY ORDERS that Defendants TSHU and Mr. & Mrs. Hughes motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. The claims against Defendants are STAYED pending the completion of arbitration proceedings between Plaintiff Baker and Defendants. The parties shall file a status report every 90 days from the date of this order regarding the status of arbitration proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/29/2021. (jl)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of non opposition to motion to compel arbitration by David Baker (Smith, Gregory)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants have filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration #5 . Plaintiff's time for opposing the motion has passed, and Plaintiff has not filed a response. See, DUCivR 7-1(b)(3)(B). Accordingly, no later than November 2, 2021, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his opposition, if any, along with an explanation for Plaintiff's failure to meet briefing deadlines. Failure to timely respond will result in the court granting the Motion to Compel Arbitration without further notice. See, DUCivR 7-1(4)(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/26/2021.
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/1/21. (ep)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendants Rhonda Hughes, Roger Hughes, Total Home Services of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Evans, Rebecca)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Anne Evans on behalf of Rhonda Hughes, Roger Hughes, Total Home Services of Utah (Evans, Rebecca)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by David Baker as to All Defendants. (Smith, Gregory)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4115537) filed by David Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Smith, Gregory)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff David Baker is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Total Home Services of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Baker
Represented By: Gregory Brent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Home Services of Utah
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hughes
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Hughes
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?