P. v. Anthem Blue Cross
Plaintiff: D. P.
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross
Case Number: 2:2021cv00549
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff D. P.. (alf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Anthem Blue Cross. (alf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Anthem Blue Cross, Plaintiff D. P.. Form due by 11/29/2021. (alf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Houpt on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross (Houpt, Timothy)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. P. as to Anthem Blue Cross Waiver sent on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (King, Brian)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross. filed by D. P.. (King, Brian)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/18/21. (alf)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4115356) filed by D. P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff D. P. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. v. Anthem Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. P.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Timothy C. Houpt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?