M. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: D. M.
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company and Intuitive Surgical Inc Benefits Plan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00552
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Intuitive Surgical Inc Benefits Plan. (Thomas, Ethan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Thomas on behalf of Intuitive Surgical Inc Benefits Plan (Thomas, Ethan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Shewan on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company (Shewan, Angela)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Houpt on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company (Houpt, Timothy)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. M. as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company Waiver sent on 10/25/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (King, Brian)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/23/21. (alf)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. M. as to Intuitive Surgical Inc Benefits Plan Waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (King, Brian)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Intuitive Surgical Inc Benefits Plan (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4119257) filed by D. M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (King, Brian)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff D. M. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Shewan
Represented By: Timothy C. Houpt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical Inc Benefits Plan
Represented By: Ethan D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?