Jensen v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jason Jensen
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Notice
Case Number: 2:2021cv00566
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Modification of Docket: Error: Incorrect service date entered on docket for Summons and Complaint. Correction: Date corrected and answer deadline corrected to 12/13/21. No further action is necessary. (alf)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Jason Jensen per attached consent form, Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi per General Order 21-005. (alf)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Kilolo Kijakazi answer due 12/13/2021. (alf)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Jason Jensen. (alf)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Jensen. SSA Notice served on 10/7/2021 , 10/12/21, answer due 12/6/2021. (Johnston, Benjamin) Modified on 10/25/2021 to correct service date. Answer deadline will be updated to reflect correct due date (alf).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Jensen. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 10/7/2021 10/12/21, answer due 12/6/2021. (Johnston, Benjamin) Modified on 10/25/2021 to correct service date. Answer deadline to be updated. (alf).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to Plaintiff - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 21 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jason Jensen. Form due by 11/3/2021. (alf)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Berndt, Amanda)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to USAG. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to USAO. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to ORCC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Originally received by the court on 09/27/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jason Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (mh)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/28/2021. (mh)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 09/27/2021) filed by Plaintiff Jason Jensen. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jensen
Represented By: Benjamin A. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?