Great Bowery v. Best Little Sites et al
Plaintiff: Great Bowery doing business as Trunk Archive
Defendant: Best Little Sites doing business as www.comicbookmovie.com, Nathan Best, Mark Cassidy and Joshua Wilding
Case Number: 2:2021cv00567
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Nathan Best, Best Little Sites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) Attorney Robert E. Aycock added to party Nathan Best(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E. Aycock added to party Best Little Sites(pty:dft)(Aycock, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Nathan Best and Best Little Sites answer to 11/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/27/21. (alf)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants Nathan Best, Best Little Sites. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney William Chadwick added to party Nathan Best(pty:dft), Attorney William Chadwick added to party Best Little Sites(pty:dft)(Chadwick, William)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 Modification of Docket: Error: Document should have been filed as a Summons Returned Executed ONLY and not an Affidavit of Service (not for executed summons). Correction: Affidavit language is stricken. Event type and docket text updated. No further action is needed, please note for future filings. (alf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Nathan Best on 10/07/2021, filed by Defendant Nathan Best **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bowery (Higbee, Mathew) Modified on 10/20/2021 to correct event type (alf).
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #10 Summons Returned Executed. The document is stricken as improperly filed. A copy of the Court issued summons with Clerk or Deputy Clerk's signature needs to be attached. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bowery as to Nathan Best served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (Higbee, Mathew) Modified on 10/12/2021 - stricken as improperly filed (alf).
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joshua Wilding. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Cassidy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/28/21. (alf)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Best Little Sites. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nathan Best. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mh)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Great Bowery. (Higbee, Mathew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nathan Best, Best Little Sites, Mark Cassidy, Joshua Wilding (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4122766) filed by Great Bowery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Higbee, Mathew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Great Bowery is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Bowery v. Best Little Sites et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Bowery doing business as Trunk Archive
Represented By: Mathew K. Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Little Sites doing business as www.comicbookmovie.com
Represented By: Robert E. Aycock
Represented By: William Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Best
Represented By: Robert E. Aycock
Represented By: William Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Wilding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?