Lokai Holding v. Sundberg et al
Plaintiff: Lokai Holding
Defendant: Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv00707
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0044
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum, for Defendants Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. (nl)
December 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ronald S. Bienstock, for Plaintiff Lokai Holding. (nl)
December 2, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael James Sheppeard, for Plaintiff Lokai Holding. (nl)
December 2, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from USDC of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04466. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. District of Utah case number 2:21-cv-00707-TS, Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart.
November 22, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Utah.(rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION & ORDER re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. filed by Rachel Sundberg, Brett Sundberg. Defendants' motion to transfer to Utah is granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/22/2021) (rro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Joshua S. Rupp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/1/2021) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joshua S. Rupp and Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated 10/20/2021. Document filed by Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg..(Rupp, Joshua) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. . Document filed by Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
October 18, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum on behalf of Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. New Address: Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C., The Holyoke-Manhattan Building, 80 South Highland Avenue, Ossining, NY, United States 10562, (914) 941-5668..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. . Document filed by Lokai Holding. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Izen, #2 Declaration of Ronald S. Bienstock).(Sheppeard, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Joshua S. Rupp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25188155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua S. Rupp in Support of Por Hac Vice Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order).(Rupp, Joshua) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
October 13, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Joshua S. Rupp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25188155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. . Document filed by Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sundberg Decl).(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer. Document filed by Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. Responses due by 10/13/2021.(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/15/2021) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brett Sundberg answer due 9/29/2021; Rachel Sundberg answer due 9/29/2021. (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Plaintiff dated 14 Sept 2021. Document filed by Lokai Holding..(Sheppeard, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael J Sheppeard on behalf of the Plaintiff dated 23 August 2021., #2 Complaint. Granted. Brett Sundberg answer due 9/15/2021; Rachel Sundberg answer due 9/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/24/2021) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Michael J Sheppeard on behalf of the Plaintiff dated 23 August 2021. Document filed by Lokai Holding..(Sheppeard, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rachel Sundberg waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Document filed by Rachel Sundberg..(Sheppeard, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brett Sundberg waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Document filed by Lokai Holding..(Sheppeard, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg, re: #2 Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lokai Holding..(Bienstock, Ronald) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bienstock, Ronald) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bienstock, Ronald) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Brett Sundberg, Rachel Sundberg. Document filed by Lokai Holding..(Bienstock, Ronald) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald S. Bienstock. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOE(S). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ronald S. Bienstock. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ronald S. Bienstock to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Ronald S. Bienstock to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24555468)Document filed by Lokai Holding..(Bienstock, Ronald) Modified on 5/19/2021 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lokai Holding v. Sundberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lokai Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Sundberg
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Sundberg
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?