Martin v. Singleton et al
Plaintiff: Travis B. Martin and Travis Ben Martin
Defendant: Charles Singleton, Ryan LaBounty, Colby Green and Woods Cross City
Case Number: 2:2022cv00015
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for a new consent to collection form re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Travis Ben Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit inmate statement, #2 Exhibit Consent to Collection, #3 Envelope). Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(jl)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Travis Ben Martin received from Correctional Institution. (jl)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Travis Ben Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Envelope) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(jl)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request to docket #14 MOTION and information about probation form. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Response answering question about the probation form sent 2/24/22 to address on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to admit into evidence records from state cases filed by Plaintiff Travis Ben Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(jl)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of letter requesting old case information and filing information. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Pro se packet and civil rights complaint guide sent 2/22/2022 on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ryan LaBounty as to Ryan LaBounty Waiver sent on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Hoole, Gregory)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Colby Green as to Colby Green Waiver sent on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Hoole, Gregory)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Charles Singleton as to Charles Singleton Waiver sent on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Hoole, Gregory)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Woods Cross City as to Woods Cross City Waiver sent on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Hoole, Gregory)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM DECISION ORDER Regarding Service of Process. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 02/14/2022. (jl)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $28.10. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 02/08/2022. (jl)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Travis Ben Martin received from Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). (jl)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 02/01/2022. (lwh)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 01/05/2022). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Travis Ben Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (nmt)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty days to file with the Court a certified copy of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account statement(s). If Plaintiff was held at more than one institution during the past six months, Plaintiff shall file certified trust fund account statements (or institutional equivalent) from the appropriate official at each institution where Plaintiff was confined. The certified trust fund account statement(s) must show deposits and average balances for each month. If Plaintiff does not fully comply, this complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 01/06/2022. (nmt)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nmt)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 01/05/2022) filed by Plaintiff Travis B. Martin. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Singleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Ben Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan LaBounty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods Cross City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?