Hercules Industries v. Yogapipe
Plaintiff: Hercules Industries
Defendant: Yogapipe
Case Number: 2:2022cv00027
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF ADR e-mailed to Plaintiff Hercules Industries, and to Defendant Yogapipe. (eat)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Yogapipe.(Marcy, Lisa)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/6/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/9/2023. 5-Day Jury Trial is set for 1/8/2024 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/4/2022. (eat)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Marcy on behalf of Yogapipe (Marcy, Lisa)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Booth, Bryan)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Yogapipe: answer or other response due by 3/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 2/11/2022. (eat)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Hercules Industries. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Booth, Bryan)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Justin Woods, Managing Agent on 01/20/22, filed by Plaintiff Hercules Industries. (Scherer, James)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James F. Scherer for Hercules Industries.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/14/2022. (eat)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David B. Law for Hercules Industries.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/14/2022. (eat)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Scherer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4220583,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Hercules Industries. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application for Jmes F. Scherer, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of James F. Scherer)(Booth, Bryan)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David B. Law , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4220555,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Hercules Industries. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application for David B. Law, #2 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of David B. Law)(Booth, Bryan)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Yogapipe. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any Defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any Defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/11/2022. (eat)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/11/2022. (eat)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Yogapipe (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4216352) filed by Hercules Industries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Booth, Bryan)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Hercules Industries is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hercules Industries v. Yogapipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hercules Industries
Represented By: Bryan H. Booth
Represented By: David B. Law
Represented By: James F. Scherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yogapipe
Represented By: Lisa A. Marcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?