Blanchard v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Clifton P. Blanchard
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections, Ryan Garlock, FNU Eddleman and Robert Powell
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2022cv00040
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - Plaintiff's motions for service of process are DENIED, ( #20 , #23 , #25 ); however, if it later appears that this complaint states a claim upon which relief may be granted, the Court may order service of process. No further prompting by Plaintiff is needed. Plaintiff's motions for discovery and joinder are DENIED as premature. ( #13 , #15 , #17 .) The Complaint, ( #6 ), was just recently filed and has yet to be screened for merit. Though the Court has already granted Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.14 within thirty days of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff must not file any further motions or other documents during the time his complaint is being reviewed or until the Court orders otherwise. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 03/09/2022. (jl)
March 7, 2022 Filing 27 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Clifton P. Blanchard received from Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letters, #2 Envelope). (jl) Modified by sealing attachment 1 as it contains another filled out IFP on 3/8/2022 (jl).
March 7, 2022 Filing 26 REQUEST to Submit for Decision #25 MOTION to Compel Response from defendants filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
March 7, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel response from defendants filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
March 3, 2022 Filing 24 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of subpoenas and request for information if subpoenas filed incorrectly. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Did reply back informing plaintiff subpoenas will not be issued unless directed so by the court. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). (jl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2022: #3 rescanned for OCR) (kb).
February 28, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: all defendants filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 28, 2022 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS to #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 28, 2022 Filing 21 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for docket. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Docket sent 3/1/2022 to address on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 24, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: all defendants filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #9 MOTION to Compel Production of 6-Month Trust Account Statement filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. Hearing requested. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time the 6-month statement filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 14, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION grant plaintiff access to donated.pdf files from October 2021 that are religious literature filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 10, 2022 Filing 16 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Clifton P. Blanchard re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Permissive Joinder of parties filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #13 MOTION for Joinder filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Permissive Joinder of Parties filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 7, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #11 Objection to Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (jl)
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Clifton P. Blanchard re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jl)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for documents. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Documents sent to address on file 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Production of 6-Month Trust Account Statement filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl) Modified on 2/9/2022: corrected motion relief (alt)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT** Exhibit A Final-Level Administrative Grievance(s) and Response(s) and Exhibit B Recent Six-Month Statement re #6 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mh)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 01/18/2022). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (mh)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/21/2022. (mh)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel)(mh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Exhibit A Final Level Administrative Grievence(s) and Response(s) and Exhibit B Recent Six Month Statement. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(mh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Proposed Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Cover Sheet and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Appointment of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(mh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 01/18/2022) filed by Plaintiff Clifton P. Blanchard. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton P. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Garlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Eddleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?