Craighead v. AMD Pizza et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Craighead
Defendant: AMD Pizza, NFSM Pizza, Desert Sun and Charles Riddle
Case Number: 2:2022cv00083
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/22/2022. (mjm)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/16/22. (dla)
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants AMD Pizza, Desert Sun, NFSM Pizza, Charles Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Dawson, Micah)
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah D Dawson on behalf of AMD Pizza, Desert Sun, NFSM Pizza, Charles Riddle (Dawson, Micah)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 Mail sent to Randall L. Jeffs, Andrew P. Kimble Returned as Undeliverable. (dla)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Charles Riddle. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to NFSM Pizza. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Desert Sun. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AMD Pizza. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Frank V. Raimond for Anthony Craighead.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/11/22 (alt)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Andrew P. Kimble, for Plaintiff Anthony Craighead. (nmt)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank V. Raimond , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4247382,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Anthony Craighead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application (Raimond), #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Raimond))(Jeffs, Randall)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4247378) filed by Anthony Craighead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Jeffs, Randall)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Anthony Craighead is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craighead v. AMD Pizza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Craighead
Represented By: Randall L. Jeffs
Represented By: Frank V. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMD Pizza
Represented By: Micah D Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFSM Pizza
Represented By: Micah D Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Sun
Represented By: Micah D Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Riddle
Represented By: Micah D Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?