Olivares v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose F. Olivares
Defendant: C.R. England and Performance Contracting Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00123
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OBJECTION to #40 Report and Recommendations filed by Jose F. Olivares (alt)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #32 MOTION to Transfer by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Jose F. Olivares and #31 MOTION to transfer case back to USDC Eastern District of Michigan filed by Jose F. Olivares.The parties must file any objection to this Report and Recommendation within 14 days after being served with a copy of it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/12/22. (alf)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to transfer case back to USDC Eastern District of Michigan filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Olivares. (alf)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Transfer by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #31 MOTION to transfer case back to USDC Eastern District of Michigan. filed by Defendant C.R. England. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of M. Fagen, #2 Exhibit Agreement)(Priest, Katherine)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #32 MOTION to Transfer by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #31 MOTION to transfer case back to USDC Eastern District of Michigan. Response due by 3/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/4/22. (alf)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to transfer case back to USDC Eastern District of Michigan. and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Expedite consideration by judge on motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant C.R. England. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Priest, Katherine)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Priest on behalf of C.R. England (Priest, Katherine)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Hagen on behalf of C.R. England (Hagen, Scott)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 02/25/2022. (lwh)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Transfer by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Olivares. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(alf)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to transfer case back to USDC Eastern District of Michigan filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Olivares. (alf)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Franceska Edinger, for Defendant C.R. England. (nl)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Katherine J. Van Dyke, for Defendant C.R. England. (nl)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Case transferred in from USDC of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-11133. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC District of Utah case number 2:22-cv-00123-JNP, Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish.
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER overruling plaintiff's objections to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation (Dkt. 24), accepting the recommendation contained in the report and recommendation (Dkt. 23), and granting defendant's motion to change venue (Dkt.6) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #27 Order Transferring Case Outside the State of Michigan, on Jose F. Olivares,2581 International Dr.,1220C,YPSILANTI, MI 48197 (KSan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REBUTTAL to Defendant's Response in Motion, by Jose F. Olivares. (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to #24 Objection to Report and Recommendation by C.R. England, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OBJECTIONS to #23 Report and Recommendation, by Jose F. Olivares. (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant Defendant's Motion to Change Venue, Transferring This Case and the Pending Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Utah (ECF Nos. #6 , #13 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jose F. Olivares, #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by C.R. England, Inc. on Jose F. Olivares at 2581 International Dr. #1220C, YPSILANTI, MI 48197 (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by C.R. England, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying (ECF No. #20 ) Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by C.R. England, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Jose F. Olivares (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Defendant's Answer in Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Both CR English and Performance Contracting Group in Motion for Leave to File, by Jose F. Olivares. (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Defendant's Answer, by Jose F. Olivares. (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 COPY of #10 Order mailed to Jose F. Olivares and returned as undeliverable (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Requiring Response to #13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due by 7/14/2021; Reply due by 7/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Jose F. Olivares at 2581 International Dr.1220C, YPSILANTI, MI 48197 (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against CR England, by Jose F. Olivares. (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 COPY of #3 Order mailed to Jose F. Olivares and returned as undeliverable (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Striking Sur-Reply (ECF No. #8 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order to Strike on Jose F. Olivares at 2581 International Dr. 1220C, YPSILANTI, MI 48197. (MarW) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to change venue filed by Jose F. Olivares. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 [STRICKEN] RESPONSE (sur-reply) to #7 Reply by Jose F. Olivares. (DPer) Modified on 6/14/2021 (MarW). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to change venue filed by Jose F. Olivares. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2. Unpublished Cases) (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge, #4 Order, #3 Order on Jose F. Olivares,2581 International Dr., 1220C, YPSILANTI, MI 48197 (KSan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine J. Van Dyke on behalf of C.R. England, Inc.. (Van Dyke, Katherine) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by C.R. England, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 21-004939-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8467598 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Edinger, Franceska) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivares v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Olivares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England
Represented By: Katherine E. Priest
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Contracting Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?