Hall v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Virgil Hall
Defendant: United States of America, State of Utah, Washington County Purgatory Correctional Facility, Davis County Jail, Iron County Jail, Dept. of Justice, Paul Kohler, C. Aldred and K. Larsen
Case Number: 2:2022cv00182
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Correspondence from Virgil Hall (Please note: docket sheet has been mailed to Mr. Hall). (alf)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred in from USDC of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01138. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC for the District of Utah case number 2:22-cv-00182-JNP, Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish.
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(b). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/4/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Fri Mar 4 14:29:53 CST 2022 (Kratzer, Katie) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Davis County Jail, Iron County Jail, Paul Kohler, C. Aldred, K. Larsen,Terminating United States of America, Dept. of Justice (Executive Office for United States Attorneys FOIA (DOJ/EOUSA/FOIA herein)) and State of Utah Amendment to #1 Complaint none Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued no, Consents issued no, Jury demand,, filed by Virgil Hall. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Virgil Hall.(NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Court's civil complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, in accordance with the instructions set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form in accordance with the instructions set forth above within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of plaintiff's amended complaint, the Court will review it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/18/2022. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Tue Jan 18 13:37:27 CST 2022 (Kratzer, Katie) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Sep 21 14:01:18 CDT 2021 (admin,) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Virgil Hall. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Virgil Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Purgatory Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Aldred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?