Halac v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Serdar Halac
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 2:2022cv00235
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serdar Halac. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Hamilton, R.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serdar Halac. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 4/18/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Hamilton, R.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serdar Halac. (Hamilton, R.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serdar Halac. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/18/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Hamilton, R.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serdar Halac. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 4/18/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Hamilton, R.)
April 7, 2022 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the United States Attorney's Office District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
April 7, 2022 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
April 7, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alejandro Mayorkas. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a schedule to Defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utahs website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/6/2022. (reb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Martin J. Lawler, for Plaintiff Serdar Halac. (mh)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Martin J. Lawler for Serdar Halac.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/5/2022. (reb)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/5/2022. (tlc)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martin J. Lawler , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4297160,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Serdar Halac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Admission Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hamilton, R.)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Serdar Halac (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4297095) filed by Serdar Halac. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Hamilton, R.)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff Serdar Halac is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halac v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serdar Halac
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Martin J. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?