Shosted v. DeJoy
Plaintiff: Russell Shosted
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 2:2022cv00274
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/20/22. (alf)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Form has now passed. The party failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate presider assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish as presider and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg as (b)1(B) referral judge. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case as presider. (alf)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/27/22. (alf)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiff - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 28 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Russell Shosted. Form due by 5/18/2022. (mh)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Russell Shosted. (mh)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 4681098350) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Russell Shosted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shosted v. DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Shosted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?