B&B Prospector Properties v. Vega International et al
Plaintiff: B&B Prospector Properties
Defendant: Vega International a Utah corporation doing business as Celluvation and Jos Daniel
Case Number: 2:2022cv00286
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of acknowledgment of receipt re #6 Memorandum Decision from 3rd District Court Summit County. (jl)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to 3rd District Court, Summit County via via mail: docket sheet and remand order sent. (jl)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Remanding Case - It is ORDERED that this action be remanded to the Third Judicial District Court, Summit County, State of Utah. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/11/2022. (jl)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated per #6 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Remanding Case. (jl)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 4 . Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. On 04/26/2022, Defendant Jos Daniel removed this action from state court to this court and filed #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction-Notice of Defamation, in which he requests emergency injunctive relief. Because Defendant Vega International Inc. dba Celluvation has not yet entered an appearance, consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge by all parties is not feasible at this time. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 05/11/2022. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jos Daniel re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (mh)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction-Notice of Defamation, filed by Defendant Jos Daniel. (mh)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District, Summit County, case number 200500332. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4681098398) filed by Jos Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Document Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 2C, #7 Exhibit 2D, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit Attachment A, #10 Exhibit Attachment B, #11 Exhibit Third District Court, Summit County Complaint, #12 Exhibit Third District, Summit County Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&B Prospector Properties v. Vega International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&B Prospector Properties
Represented By: Alex B. Leeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vega International a Utah corporation doing business as Celluvation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?