Mouille v. Polanco
Plaintiff: Anthony Mouille
Defendant: Alma Polanco
Case Number: 2:2022cv00478
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY WITH DUCivR 81-2(c). The deadline concerning scheduling set forth in DUCivR 81-2(c) has expired. The parties are hereby ordered to comply with the scheduling requirements of DUCivR 81-2(c) within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 09/07/2022. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
August 15, 2022 Filing 8 Remark: The deadline for submission of the Magistrate Availability Form has now passed. One or more of the parties failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate presider assignment and shall remain with District Judge. (alf)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendant Alma Polanco. (alf)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/21/2022. (eat)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE - Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may only preside over this case if all parties voluntarily sign and return the #Consent Form To consent, to have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Anthony Mouille. (Notice generated by Court) Form due by 8/11/2022. (ks)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR e-mailed to Plaintiff Anthony Mouille, and to Defendant Alma Polanco. (eat)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Alma Polanco.(Jones, Matthew)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court Salt Lake County, case number 220902829, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BUTDC-4396077) filed by Alma Polanco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Jones, Matthew)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Defendant Alma Polanco is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mouille v. Polanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mouille
Represented By: Parker A. Allred
Represented By: Colby B. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Polanco
Represented By: Robert L. Janicki
Represented By: Matthew A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?