Lopez v. USA
Plaintiff: Jerry Ernest Lopez
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00479
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT: 1. Mr. Lopez is ordered to move for leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The words Amended Complaint should appear in the caption of the draft amended complaint that must be attached to his motion for leave to amend the complaint under DUCivR 15-1. 2. Once filed, the court will screen the amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2(b). 3. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in a recommendation to dismiss this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 09/09/2022. (kpf)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Jerry Ernest Lopez. (jrj)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable no such number. Mail sent to Jerry Ernest Lopez re #7 and 8 . Emailed them to jlopeezy776@gmail.com along with Email Filing and Electronic Notification Form on 7/19/2022. (jl)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Form has now passed. The party did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate presider assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett as (b)(1)(B) referral judge. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case as presider. (alf)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Mail sent to Jerry Ernest Lopez re docket entry #7 Returned as Undeliverable - No Such Number. It appears that the directionals were reversed so address has been corrected to 440 S 500 E and docket entry notice will be resent to that address. (alt) Modified on 8/11/2022: corrected Date Filed (alt)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/26/22. (alf)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jerry Ernest Lopez. (mh)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against USA (Originally received by the court on 07/20/2022). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jerry Ernest Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (mh)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED:1. The court will screen this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and DUCivR 3-2(b).2. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court.3. If the action is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on the Defendant.4. Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/21/2022. (mh)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jerry Ernest Lopez. Form due by 8/10/2022. (mh)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Exhibit, Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 07/20/2022) filed by Plaintiff Jerry Ernest Lopez. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Ernest Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?