Utah Animal Rights Coalition et al v. Beaver County et al
Plaintiff: Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Curtis A. Vollmar, Alexander J. Taylor and Maxwell J. Corwin
Defendant: Beaver County, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey and Lonnie Laws
Case Number: 2:2022cv00497
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Filing 45 OBJECTIONS to #43 Appendix,,, #42 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Mylar, Frank)
September 23, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Notice of Conventional Filing of Certain Exhibits for the Exhibits Appendix filed by Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar re #43 Appendix,,, #42 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, (Porter, Karra)
September 23, 2022 Filing 43 APPENDIX to #42 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A C (flash drive), #2 Exhibit D Declaration of Almira Tanner Affidavit with Ex 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit E Declaration of Curtis Vollmar with E-1 and E-2, #4 Exhibit F Plat Map, #5 Exhibit G Laws Police Report Redacted, #6 Exhibit H - GoogleMaps Image, #7 Exhibit I (flash drive), #8 Exhibit J Declaration of Jeremy Beckham, #9 Exhibit K N (flash drive), #10 Exhibit O Citation Redacted, #11 Exhibit P Woolsey Police Report RedactedP Woolsey Police Report Redacted, #12 Exhibit Q Declaration of Maxwell Corwin, #13 Exhibit R Declaration of Alexander Taylor)(Porter, Karra)
September 23, 2022 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar. (Porter, Karra)
September 23, 2022 Filing 41 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing reset for 10/12/2022 at 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Hearing reset at the request of defense counsel. (lwh)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/14/2022. (alf)
September 14, 2022 Filing 39 Modification of Docket re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time : Error: The document should have been filed using the event "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply" and linked to the appropriate motion. Correction: Event type corrected, docket text modified and linked to motion to correct filing. No further action is needed. Please note for future reference. (alf)
September 14, 2022 Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for 1-Week Extension to File Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Christiansen, Anna) Modified on 9/14/2022 - correct event type and docket entry text (alf).
September 12, 2022 Filing 37 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing reset for 10/7/2022 at 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Hearing reset at the request of the parties. (lwh)
September 9, 2022 Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing reset for 10/6/2022 at 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Hearing reset at the request of plaintiff. (lwh)
September 9, 2022 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing reset for 10/4/2022 at 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Hearing reset due to court calendar. (lwh)
September 8, 2022 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Evelyn M. Jensen re #30 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Mylar, Frank)
September 8, 2022 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Chris D. Eyre re #30 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Mylar, Frank)
September 8, 2022 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Brent Blackner re #30 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Mylar, Frank)
September 8, 2022 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Sheriff Cameron Noel re #30 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Mylar, Frank)
September 8, 2022 Filing 30 Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Mylar, Frank)
September 6, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey.(Mylar, Frank)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants must file their Response to #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by September 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 08/29/2022. (skd)
August 29, 2022 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Mylar, Frank)
August 26, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Defendants Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey (Mylar, Frank)
August 25, 2022 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing reset for 9/27/2022 at 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Hearing reset at the request of the parties. (lwh)
August 22, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #20 filed by Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar (Christiansen, Anna)
August 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2022 at 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. (lwh)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER The court sets the following briefing schedule for the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction: The response brief shall be due by September 2, 2022 and the reply brief shall be due by September 16, 2022. The court will hold an evidentiary hearing on September 22, 2022 over Zoom. The parties should be prepared to present any witness testimony or exhibits related to the request for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/22/22. (ksb)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 08/22/2022. (lwh)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 08/22/2022. (lwh)
August 18, 2022 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Reissued Electronically as to Beaver County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 17, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Mylar on behalf of Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey (Mylar, Frank)
August 16, 2022 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Curtis A. Vollmar, Alexander J. Taylor, Maxwell J. Corwin as to Warren G. Woolsey served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Warren G. Woolsey)(Christiansen, Anna)
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Curtis A. Vollmar, Alexander J. Taylor, Maxwell J. Corwin as to Lonnie Laws served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Lonnie Laws)(Christiansen, Anna)
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Curtis A. Vollmar, Alexander J. Taylor, Maxwell J. Corwin as to Cameron Noel served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Cameron Noel)(Christiansen, Anna)
August 16, 2022 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Curtis A. Vollmar, Alexander J. Taylor, Maxwell J. Corwin as to Beaver County served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - Beaver County)(Christiansen, Anna)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Tena Campbell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish for all further proceedings - case number is now 2:22cv00497 JNP. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/8/22 (alt)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to District Judge per docket text order 10 .Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/4/22. (alf)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case, the pending #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the need to decide this motion in a judicious and timely manner, the undersigned orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/4/2022. (jfm)
August 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Erratum by Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar re #2 Complaint, (Christiansen, Anna)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Warren G. Woolsey. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lonnie Laws. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Cameron Noel. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Beaver County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 Modification of Docket re #2 Complaint: Error: Per counsel, the complaint originally filed with wrong document attached. Correction: Correct document is now attached as proper complaint. (alf)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar. (Porter, Karra)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Beaver County, Lonnie Laws, Cameron Noel, Warren G. Woolsey (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4405715) filed by Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Curtis A. Vollmar, Alexander J. Taylor, Maxwell J. Corwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Porter, Karra) (alf).
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs Maxwell J. Corwin, Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area, Alexander J. Taylor, Utah Animal Rights Coalition, Curtis A. Vollmar are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utah Animal Rights Coalition et al v. Beaver County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Animal Rights Coalition
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Anna Pitcher Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Action Everywhere SF Bay Area
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Anna Pitcher Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis A. Vollmar
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Anna Pitcher Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander J. Taylor
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Anna Pitcher Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell J. Corwin
Represented By: Karra J. Porter
Represented By: Anna Pitcher Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaver County
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Represented By: Andrew R. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Noel
Represented By: Andrew R. Hopkins
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren G. Woolsey
Represented By: Andrew R. Hopkins
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Laws
Represented By: Andrew R. Hopkins
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?